judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRODEY A. BURNETT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0081)
Case Number:S-11-0081Case Docketed On:04/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BRODEY A. BURNETT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRODEY A. BURNETT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrodey A. BurnettDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2011 WY 169
Citation:267 P.3d 1083

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/24/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/29/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts, Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - (by phone) Mike Pauling for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/26/2011Motion - Other - Vacate oral argument settingMotionOtherFinal
10/26/2011Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
10/28/2011Order - Order rescheduling setting for oral argument.OrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - D. Michael Pauling for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/10/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/10/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/28/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a special concurrence.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/13/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/19/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal