judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLOS A. CARBAGAL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0089
Short Caption:CARLOS A. CARBAGAL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-16050-09Filed Date:01/25/2011

Opening Event Date:01/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/15/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlos A. Carbagal Y
Eric H. KirchmanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Eric H. Kirchman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/09/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Eric H. Kirchman, Esquire
03/09/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (6 pgs/tape) 11/8/10 proc. (a.m.)
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (86 pgs/Shelton) 11/8/10 proc. (a.m.)
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10 pgs/tape) 11/10/10 proc.
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (6 pgs/tape) 1/4/11 proc. w/cd
03/15/2011RECORD INDEX
03/15/2011RECORD COPIES
03/15/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (9 pgs/tape) 1/18/11 proc.
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 26, 2011. (JAC)
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/27/2011APPENDIX
08/01/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal - or in the alternative motion for summary affirmance (Appellee)
08/04/2011FiledTMC-MOTION TO DISMISS OR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE-OPPO
08/15/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion to dismiss or in the alternative motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
11/01/2011FiledOrder Granting motion to dismiss appeal or in the alternative for summary affirmance
11/01/2011FiledDismissed
11/23/2011FiledMandate