In the District Court in and for muskogee County , Oklahoma
STATE OF OKLAHOMA V. KAYLA ANN JONES | No. CF-2016-00034 (Criminal Felony) Filed: 01/12/2016 Judge: NORMAN, MIKE |
Parties
JONES, KAYLA ANN , Defendant
Attorneys
Attorney | Represented Parties |
---|---|
LOGE, ORVIL DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 220 STATE STREET MUSKOGEE , OK 74401 |
Events
Event | Party | Docket | Reporter |
---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 WARRANT ISSUED | |||
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 at 10:00AM SOUNDING DOCKET | |||
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 at 9:00AM SOUNDING DOCKET | |||
Monday, February 1, 2016 at 9:00AM MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY | |||
Tuesday, May 3, 2016 at 9:00AM PRELIMINARY HEARING | |||
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 at 9:00AM PRELIMINARY HEARING | |||
Monday, August 8, 2016 at 9:00AM CHECK STATUS | |||
Friday, September 9, 2016 at 9:00AM CHECK STATUS | |||
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 at 9:00AM CHECK STATUS | |||
Friday, September 16, 2016 at 9:00AM CHECK STATUS | |||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 at 1:30PM DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT | |||
Thursday, November 10, 2016 at 1:30PM DISTRICT COURT ARRAIGNMENT | |||
Friday, January 13, 2017 at 9:00AM DISPOSITION DOCKET | |||
Friday, April 28, 2017 at 9:00AM MOTION FOR JOINDER | |||
Tuesday, May 2, 2017 at 9:00AM MOTION FOR JOINDER | |||
Friday, May 5, 2017 at 9:00AM DISPOSITION DOCKET | |||
Friday, May 5, 2017 at 9:00AM DECISION | |||
Friday, August 18, 2017 at 9:00AM DISPOSITION DOCKET | |||
Friday, September 15, 2017 at 1:30PM PLEA | |||
Friday, September 15, 2017 GUILTY PLEA | |||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | |||
Monday, September 18, 2017 at 9:00AM JURY TRIAL | |||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 at 1:30PM JUDICIAL REVIEW | |||
Friday, September 28, 2018 at 9:00AM REVIEW | |||
Monday, January 28, 2019 at 9:00AM REVIEW | |||
Monday, April 29, 2019 at 9:00AM REVIEW | |||
Thursday, May 16, 2019 at 10:00AM REVIEW | |||
Wednesday, November 6, 2019 at 10:00AM REVIEW |
Counts
1. CHILD ABUSE BY INJURY (FELONY)
2. CHILD NEGLECT (FELONY)
Docket
Date | Code | Description | Count | Party | Amount |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01-12-2016 | FILE, ENTER, RECORD INFORMATION Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 103.00 | |||
LAW LIBRARY FEE | $ 6.00 | ||||
SHERIFF'S FEE | $ 5.00 | ||||
AUTOMATED FINGERPRINT INFORMATION SYSTEM | $ 5.00 | ||||
CLEET ASSESSMENT | $ 9.00 | ||||
STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE | $ 5.00 | ||||
10% OF AFS1 | $ 0.50 | ||||
10% OF CLT9 | $ 0.90 | ||||
10% OF FORE | $ 0.50 | ||||
OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 | $ 25.00 | ||||
DA REVOLVING FUND | $ 25.00 | ||||
10% OF DACF | $ 2.50 | ||||
MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND | $ 10.00 | ||||
10% OF MLRF | $ 1.00 | ||||
SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT | $ 10.00 | ||||
10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE | $ 1.00 | ||||
CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT | $ 3.00 | ||||
10% OF CAMA FEE | $ 0.30 | ||||
ATTORNEY GENERAL FEE | $ 3.00 | ||||
10% OF ATTORNEY GENERAL | $ 0.30 | ||||
01-12-2016 | COUNT002 FILE, ENTER, RECORD INFORMATION | $ 103.00 | |||
LAW LIBRARY FEE | $ 6.00 | ||||
SHERIFF'S FEE | $ 5.00 | ||||
AUTOMATED FINGERPRINT INFORMATION SYSTEM | $ 5.00 | ||||
CLEET ASSESSMENT | $ 9.00 | ||||
STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE | $ 5.00 | ||||
10% OF AFS1 | $ 0.50 | ||||
10% OF CLT9 | $ 0.90 | ||||
10% OF FORE | $ 0.50 | ||||
OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 | $ 25.00 | ||||
DA REVOLVING FUND | $ 25.00 | ||||
10% OF DACF | $ 2.50 | ||||
MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND | $ 10.00 | ||||
10% OF MLRF | $ 1.00 | ||||
SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT | $ 10.00 | ||||
10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE | $ 1.00 | ||||
CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT | $ 3.00 | ||||
10% OF CAMA FEE | $ 0.30 | ||||
ATTORNEY GENERAL FEE | $ 3.00 | ||||
10% OF ATTORNEY GENERAL | $ 0.30 | ||||
01-12-2016 | WARRANT OF ARREST:WRIT- ISSUED SHERIFF IN COUNTY Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 50.00 | |||
OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 | $ 25.00 | ||||
01-13-2016 | ORIGINAL WARRANT RETURN Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
01-13-2016 | ST/T.KING.DEFT/PRO SE. BOND $200,000. SOUNDING 1-27-16 Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
@ 9AM. COURT TO APPOINT ATTY. IF BOND IS MADE MUST | |||||
RETAIN OWN ATTY. DEFT ADMONISHED FROM ALL COMMUNICATION | |||||
WITH ANY WITNESS/VICTIM.RA. | |||||
01-14-2016 | DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCE & ORDER OF APPOINTMENT Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
01-14-2016 | COMMITMENT Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
01-14-2016 | APPEARANCE BOND/B.TODD/LUMBERMENS/$200,000/#792735 Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 10.00 | |||
JAIL FUND FEE | $ 25.00 | ||||
10% OF BOJ TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND | $ 2.50 | ||||
01-22-2016 | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
01-22-2016 | MOTION FOR DISCOVERY Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
01-22-2016 | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY OF Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
RECORD | |||||
01-22-2016 | ORDER FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COURT Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
APPOINTED ATTORNEY OF RECORD | |||||
01-26-2016 | NOTICE OF HEARING Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
01-26-2016 | ST/ R. FERGUSON; DEFT/ D. BAKER; PH SET ON 5-3-16 | ||||
AT 9AM, HEARING TO BEGIN AT 9AM. RA | |||||
01-29-2016 | CORRECTION TO ACCOUNTING ENTRIES OF INITIAL BOND FILING | $ 25.00 | |||
(Entry with fee only) | $ -25.00 | ||||
(Entry with fee only) | $ -2.50 | ||||
02-01-2016 | MOTION TO WITHDRAW GRANTED WITHOUT OBJECTION, DEFT. TO | ||||
HIRE ATTORNEY. RA | |||||
04-18-2016 | CRIMINAL SUBPOENA ISSUED SHERIFF IN COUNTY (1 ADDRESS): Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 200.00 | |||
OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE | $ 25.00 | ||||
04-18-2016 | MOTION/ORDER TO ENDORSE ADDITIONAL WITNESSES Document Unavailable (#CC16041800000221) | ||||
04-20-2016 | CRIMINAL SUBPOENA ISSUED SHERIFF IN COUNTY (1 ADDRESS): Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 100.00 | |||
04-20-2016 | MOTION/ORDER TO ENDORSE ADDITIONAL WITNESSES Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
04-20-2016 | NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE HEARSAY STATEMENTS OF Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
CHILD UNDER AGE OF THIRTEEN YEARS | |||||
04-25-2016 | SUBPOENA RETURN Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
04-26-2016 | MOTION/ORDER TO ENDORSE ADDITIONAL WITNESSES Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
04-26-2016 | CRIMINAL SUBPOENA ISSUED SHERIFF:OKLAHOMA COUNTY Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 50.00 | |||
OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM | $ 25.00 | ||||
04-27-2016 | DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS STATE'S NOTICE PURSUANT TO 12 Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
O.S. SECTIONS 2803.1 AND 2803(4) | |||||
05-03-2016 | STATE/O.LOGE; DEFT W/D.BAKER; PASSED BY AGREEMENT TO | ||||
7-27-16 AT 9AM/ RA | |||||
07-18-2016 | CIVIL SUBPOENA ISSUED SHERIFF IN COUNTY (1 ADDRESS) Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 50.00 | |||
07-26-2016 | SUBPOENA RETURN Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
07-27-2016 | ST/ N. CHING AND O. LOGE; DEFT/ D.BAKER; ON THE REC | ||||
WITH CRT REP/ S. FLORES FOR PH; TESTIMONY TAKEN, STATE | |||||
REST AND TO FILE BRIEF BY 8-8-16; DEFT. TO RESPOND BY | |||||
9-9-16; RULING BY FAX ON OR BEFORE 9-13-16. RA | |||||
08-02-2016 | STATE'S RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO SUPPRESS VICTIMS Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
STATEMENTS | |||||
08-11-2016 | WITNESS FEE PAID BY MUSKOGEE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTY Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | $ 182.82 | |||
08-24-2016 | DEFENDANTS REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
OBJECTIONS TO STATES NOTICE PURSUANT TO 12 O.S. | |||||
SECTIONS 2803.1 AND 2803 (4) | |||||
09-16-2016 | NOTICE OF FILING Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-19-2016 | ST/ O. LOGE; DEFT/ D. BAKER; RULING IS AS FOLLOWS: | ||||
HEARSAY TESTIMONY PERMITTED, STATE REST, DEMURRER | |||||
OVERRULED AND DEFT. BOUND OVER AS CHARGED, DCA SET FOR | |||||
10-13-16 AT 1:30PM. RA | |||||
10-11-2016 | PASS TO 11/10/16 AT 1:30. MN | ||||
10-20-2016 | MOTION/ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
10-21-2016 | DEFENDANTS DEMUR AND MOTION TO QUASH Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
11-01-2016 | STATES RESPONSE TO THE DEFENSE DEMUR & MOTION TO QUASH Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
11-10-2016 | CM ST/ROBERTS; D. BAKER | ||||
DCA: DEF PNG - MOT. IN 30 DAYS, MUTUAL DISC. ORDER | |||||
DISPO DOCKET 1-13-17 @ 9AM - MOT TO BE SET ON APP TA | |||||
01-13-2017 | DISPO. DA: O. LOGE. DEF: D. BAKER. STRICKEN TO NEXT | ||||
DOCKET 05/05/17 AT 9:00. MN | |||||
03-27-2017 | MOTION FOR JOINDER OF JURY TRIALS Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
04-13-2017 | DEFENDANT OBJECTION TO STATE'S MOTION FOR JOINDER Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
04-17-2017 | ORDER FOR HEARING Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
04-28-2017 | PASS BY DEFENDANT ATTORNEY TO 05/02/17 AT 9:00. MN | ||||
04-28-2017 | MOTION/ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
05-02-2017 | MOTION. DA: N. CHING. DEF: D. BAKER. ORAL ARGUMENTS | ||||
TO COURT. TO READ BRIEFS. DECISION SET 05/05/17 AT | |||||
9:00. PARTIES TO HIRE SEPARATE ATTORNEYS. MN | |||||
05-03-2017 | STATES RESPONSE TO THE DEFENSE OBJECTION TO JOINDER Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
05-04-2017 | MOTION. DA: N. CHING/O.LOGE. DEF: D. BAKER. IN CAMERA | ||||
ARGUMENTS TO JUDGE. CASE SEVERED. CR: SHANNON FLORES. | |||||
MN | |||||
05-04-2017 | COURT REPORTER FEE - CRIMINAL | $ 20.00 | |||
05-09-2017 | DISPO. DA: O. LOGE. DEF: E. JONES. STRICKEN TO NEXT | ||||
DOCKET. SET 08/18/17 AT 9:00 FOR DISPO. MN | |||||
05-16-2017 | MOTION/ORDER TO ENDORSE ADDITIONAL WITNESSES Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
05-17-2017 | MOTION/ORDER TO ENDORSE ADDITIONAL WITNESS(ES) Document Unavailable (#CC17051700000920) | ||||
05-25-2017 | AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE HEARSAY Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
STATEMENTS OF CHILD UNDER THE AGE OF THIRTEEN YEARS | |||||
07-24-2017 | SUPBOENA ISSUED Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
07-24-2017 | SUPBOENA ISSUED Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
07-24-2017 | SUPBOENA ISSUED Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
07-24-2017 | SUPBOENA ISSUED Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
07-25-2017 | MOTION/ORDER TO ENDORSE ADDITIONAL WITNESS(ES) Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
07-28-2017 | SUBPOENA RETURN Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
07-28-2017 | SUBPOENA RETURN Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
08-02-2017 | MOTION FOR DISCOVERY Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
08-02-2017 | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
08-18-2017 | DISPO. DA: O. LOGE. DEF: E. JONES. SET FOR JURY | ||||
TRIAL. MN | |||||
08-23-2017 | MOTION FOR DISCOVERY Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
08-25-2017 | PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-15-2017 | PLEA. DA: O. LOGE. DEF: E. JONES. DEFENDANT ENTERS | ||||
PLEA OF NO CONTEST. SENTENCED EACH COUNT 20 YEARS DOC | |||||
WITH 1 YEAR JUDICIAL REVIEW. FINES/COSTS. JUDICIAL | |||||
REVIEW SET 09/13/18 AT 1:30. MN | |||||
09-15-2017 | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-15-2017 | SUMMARY OF FACTS Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-15-2017 | FINE COUNT 1 | $ 1,000.00 | |||
09-15-2017 | ENTER FEL NON-VIOLENT VICTIM COMPENSATION AMOUNT HERE | $ 500.00 | |||
FIGURE 10% OF TOTAL VCAV ASSESSMENT AND ENTER AMOUNT HER | $ 50.00 | ||||
15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND | $ 75.00 | ||||
09-15-2017 | DNA LAB FEE | $ 150.00 | |||
10 % COURT CLERK FEE | $ 15.00 | ||||
SHERIFFS DNA TESTING FEE | $ 15.00 | ||||
15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND | $ 22.50 | ||||
09-15-2017 | FINE COUNT 2 | $ 1,000.00 | |||
09-15-2017 | ENTER FEL NON-VIOLENT VICTIM COMPENSATION AMOUNT HERE | $ 500.00 | |||
FIGURE 10% OF TOTAL VCAV ASSESSMENT AND ENTER AMOUNT HER | $ 50.00 | ||||
15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND | $ 75.00 | ||||
09-15-2017 | COST REVIEWED/KP Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-18-2017 | COMMITMENT Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
08-31-2018 | WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
08-31-2018 | DOC REPORT Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-05-2018 | OKLAHOMA CITY VOFS WAS MAILED | $ -50.00 | |||
09-13-2018 | ST; O. LOGE. DEFT; E. JONES. DEFT APPEARS WITH ATTY. | ||||
JUDICIAL REVIEW GRANTED. BALANCE OF SENTENCE S/S. DEFT | |||||
IS TO HAVE NO CONTACT WITH VICTIMS. REVIEW SET | |||||
09-28-18 @ 9:00AM. FINES & COSTS AS ORDERED. MN | |||||
09-14-2018 | ORDER GRANTING JUDICIAL REVIEW Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-14-2018 | DOC RULES AND CONDITIONS Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
09-28-2018 | ST; N. CHING. DEFT; PRO SE. DEFT HAS PAID CC FINES AND | ||||
COSTS. OWES DA 991 FEES. DEFT TO REPORT TO DASP & SET | |||||
PAY PLAN FOR THOSE FEES TODAY. TO PAY $40 PER MONTH | |||||
ON THE LAST MONDAY OF EVERY MONTH. DEFT DID NOT REPORT | |||||
AS REQUIRED BY RULES & CONDITIONS ENTERED UPON RELEASE, | |||||
TO P&P. J. WALKER APPEARS TODAY. REQUEST REVIEW | |||||
01-28-18 @ 9:00 TO CHECK STATUS OF P&P IN TULSA IF DEFT | |||||
WANTS TO CONTINUE TRANSFER. MN | |||||
04-25-2019 | PASS NEXT REVIEW FROM 04-29-19 TO 05-16-19 @ 10:00AM. | ||||
JUDGE ALFORD WILL BE OUT 04-29-19. KS | |||||
05-16-2019 | ST: M. MUZL. DEFT IN COMPLIANCE. CONTINUE NEXT REVIEW | ||||
TO 11-06-19 @ 10:00AM.. TA | |||||
07-15-2019 | NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ACTIVE PROBATION SUPERVISION Pursuant to 12 O.S. § 39, Document Available at Court Clerk's Office | ||||
11-05-2019 | DANIELLE FROM E. JONES OFFICE CALLED. REVIEW IS | ||||
STRICKEN BY AGREEMENT WITH O. LOGE. TO BE RESET UPON | |||||
APPLICATION. KS |