judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. 7TH JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33539
Short Caption:STATE VS. 7TH JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/31/1998Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 98-00591
12/31/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus 98-00593
01/05/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge. Due Date: 10 days. 99-00032
01/05/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
01/11/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Petition. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 99-00157
02/02/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. On January 11, 1999, petitioner filed a notice of withdrawal of this petition. Judgment: " . . . we dismiss this appeal." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB. 99-00701