judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES M. HOFF v. KIMBERLY M. HOFF

Case Heading (S-11-0082)
Case Number:S-11-0082Case Docketed On:04/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JAMES M. HOFF v. KIMBERLY M. HOFF
Full Title:JAMES M. HOFF, Appellant (Defendant), v. KIMBERLY M. HOFF, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames M. HoffJohn D. Chambers
AppelleeKimberly Marie HoffDwight F. Hurich
Paul Sanford Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/06/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/15/2011Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant. Notified prematurely that case was ready to docket, Statement of the Evidence is being prepared. Suggested that counsel might want to stay the appeal until it is finalized.EventPhone CallFinal
04/25/2011Motion - Stay - otherMotionStay - otherFinal
04/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - motion for stay of appeal or extension of time.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/25/2011Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Received copy of plaintiff/appellee's objections and proposed amendment to defendant/appellant's statement of evidence pursuant to rules 3.03 and 2.05 W.R.A.P.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/03/2011System - Status check - other. Contacted Judge Arnold regarding status of approval of Statement of Evidence pursuant to W.R.A.P. 3.03. Had a hearing two weeks ago re child support and visitation. He'll enter order on those issues soon. However, he indicated that neither counsel has presented proposed statement of the evidence to him.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
06/07/2011Event - Phone Call. Counsel for appellant returned call regarding status of statement of the evidence. He had served Judge Arnold, but will contact him regarding the statement.EventPhone CallFinal
06/29/2011System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of statement of evidence and status of the case. He indicated that Judge Arnold had requested briefing on an issue in the companion case, and he believes there may be a dismissal depending upon the outcome of the second case. Requested that he keep the court informed of the status.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
07/27/2011System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant's office and left message requesting status report.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
07/27/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellant indicating that an order was filed last week, and he will be talking to his client to make a final decision on the case status.EventPhone CallFinal
08/15/2011System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of case. He indicated that his statement of evidence and objection had both been filed in April, but Judge Arnold has not approved it. He also indicated that an order in the companion case was filed 7/15/11, so if no notice of appeal is filed today, he will move to dismiss this case. He requested two days in which to notify court of dismissal.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
08/18/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellant indicating that he will be filing a stipulated motion to dismiss.EventPhone CallFinal
08/25/2011Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
08/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/26/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/26/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal