judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NASCIMENTO VS. STATE BAR OF NEVADA

Case Information: 36380
Short Caption:NASCIMENTO VS. STATE BAR OF NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37693
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D247104Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. State Bar counsel's Failure to Act in Unethical and Criminal Conduct Notice of Corruption Unethical Conduct by Attorney Rebecca Miller Nevada Bar No. 2721--Writ of Mandamus. 00-11374
07/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we the petition." fn1[We conclude that petitioner has not demonstrated good cause to waive the filing fee. This constitutes an independent basis for denial of the petition.] fn2[Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioner. The relief requested is denied as moot in light of this order. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12902
08/22/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-14676
08/22/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/05/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. w/letter: Request for Appearing in Pro Se, Petition for Rehearing and Opening Brief, Appellant's Appendix and $100 filing fee (No. 1386).
10/11/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Joseph F. Nascimento--check no. 1434.
12/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion to Recall Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.This is a motion to recall the notice in lieu of remittitur which issued on August 22, 2000, so that petitioner may file a petition for rehearing of this court's order dated July 25, 2000, denying a petition for a writ of mandamus. We are not persuaded that the notice in lieu of remittitur should be recalled. Petitioner's motion is denied. fn1[Although petitioner was not granted leave to appear in proper person, we have nevertheless considered the documents submitted by petitioner. We deny the relief requested as moot in light of this order.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-21877