judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALLY JO GRANZER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0161)
Case Number:S-09-0161Case Docketed On:08/19/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:SALLY JO GRANZER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SALLY JO GRANZER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSally Jo GranzerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2010 WY 130
Citation:239 P.3d 540

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/19/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/02/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record on appeal by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/14/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential Folder; Volume V, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden for appellant; Leda M. Pojman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/29/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/18/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal