judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AMANUEL M. ASNAKE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0122
Short Caption:AMANUEL M. ASNAKE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Lead:11-CM-0122Consolidated: 11-CM-0130
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD19749-10Filed Date:02/03/2011

Opening Event Date:02/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAmanuel M. Asnake Y
Edward E. SchwabYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kendra D. BriggsNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 11-CM-122 and 11-CM-130 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Edward Schwab, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CM-122. It is FURTHER ORDERED that David Stringer, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CM-130. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellants shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeals. (By: JAC)
03/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (11cm130) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (109pgs/Tape) 1/25/11 proc. w/CD
03/25/2011RECORD INDEX (11CM130)
03/25/2011RECORD COPIES (11CM130)
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Restitution information filed 1/28/11)******SEALED*****
03/28/2011RECORD INDEX (11CM22)
03/28/2011RECORD COPIES (11CM122)
03/28/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (restitution information filed 1/28/11 (Asnake)
03/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 17, 2011, directing counsel for appellant Amanuel M. Asnake to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant Asnake shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (8pgs/Tape) 1/28/11 proc. w/CD attached
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/12/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
04/12/2011RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcript
04/25/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript for appeal number 11-CM-122 is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendices including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's consolidated brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
04/25/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (11-CM-122)
06/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 25, 2011, directing counsel for appellants to file the briefs, and the limited appendices as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendices have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the briefs of appellants and the limited appendices shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
06/29/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Asnake)to 7/6/11 (no oppo).
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Assefa) no oppo 7/11/11
07/06/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix (Asnake)
07/14/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion in appeal no. 11-CM-122 For an extension of time to file the brief and the lodged brief and limited appendix
07/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion in appeal no. 11-cm-130 for an extension of time to file the brief to the extent
07/14/2011FiledBrief of appellant in appeal no. 11-CM-122 (Appellant)
07/14/2011FiledAppendix of appellant in appeal no. 11-CM-122 (Appellant)
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File -Brief and appendix (11-CM-130) (Appellant)
07/14/2011LodgedReceived - Brief (Appellant)
07/14/2011LodgedReceived - Appendix (Appellant)
07/22/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the brief in appeal no. 11-CM-130
07/22/2011FiledBrief of appellant in appeal no. 11-CM-130 (Appellant)
07/22/2011FiledAppendix to appellant's brief for appeal no. 11-CM-130 (Appellant)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
08/25/2011FiledTMC-CONSOLIDATED MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/20/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
12/20/2011FiledAffirmed
01/11/2012FiledMandate