judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF ALAMO HEIGHTS, TEXAS v. MRS. B. S. GERETY, ET VIR

Case: A-4571
A-4571
03/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF ALAMO HEIGHTS, TEXAS
MRS. B. S. GERETY, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/06/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
03/29/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
03/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/27/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/06/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
03/29/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
03/27/1954Response to Petition
03/27/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/20/1954Document filed (see remarks)
03/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. P. Kucera, City of DallasAmicus Curiae
City of Alamo Heights, TexasPetitioner
Oakley Yantis, et al.Amicus Curiae
Mrs. B. S. Gerety, et virRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information