judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-97-00037-CV
04-97-00037-CV
01/13/1997
Automobile Personal Injury
Valley Coca-Cola Bottling Company and David Blasquez
Magdalena Garza
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/14/1997Mandate Issued
04/14/1997Mandate Issued
02/26/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/26/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/05/1997Response to Motion Filed
02/03/1997Motion Filed
01/28/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/28/1997Show cause hearing held
01/13/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Valley Coca-cola Bottling Co.;AppellantRoger W. Hughes
William L. Pope
Magdalena GarzaAppelleeJames B. Ragan
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Starr
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
9834
n/a