judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-97-00024-CR
02-97-00024-CR
01/13/1997
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Highman, Patrick Andrew
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/21/1999Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/13/1999Motion Filed
12/11/1998Mandate Issued
11/19/1998Motion for Rehearing FiledRefused
11/04/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
08/27/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
07/14/1998Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/18/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/30/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1998Submitted
04/29/1998Submission
02/20/1998Letter to Attorneys Regarding Panel Members
06/06/1997Brief Filed
06/06/1997Case ready to be set
06/02/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/30/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/31/1997Brief Filed
01/29/1997No Description Available.
01/27/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/24/1997No Description Available.
01/22/1997Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
01/13/1997Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
01/13/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/11/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Highman, Patrick AndrewCriminal - AppellantHon. Sue Walker
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasTim Curry
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant
0582215D
CT1: 50 yrs IDTDCJ