judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SATTELBERG VS. TOM TERRY ENTERPRISES

Case Information: 33535
Short Caption:SATTELBERG VS. TOM TERRY ENTERPRISESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV13727Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/1999 / Kaufman, JerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Donald D. Beury--check no. 1491.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00558
12/29/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Case appeal statement, district court docket entries, notice of entry of order, judgment, district court minutes. Due Date: 10 days
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. district court docket entries, order, notice of entry of order and minutes. 99-00048
01/05/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/01/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement and a Case Appeal Statement (no postmark). 99-00664
02/04/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The clerk shall file the docketing statement submitted on January 28, 1999. Appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file two certified copies of the case appeal statement. 99-00795
02/04/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00589
02/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 1/26/99. 99-00953
02/24/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01265
02/24/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-01266
02/24/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-01267
03/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NRAP 42(b). SNP 99-01483
03/03/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.