judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE STATE OF WYOMING v. JASON D. HOLOHAN

Case Heading (S-11-0078)
Case Number:S-11-0078Case Docketed On:04/04/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING v. JASON D. HOLOHAN
Full Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING, Petitioner, v. JASON D. HOLOHAN, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek
RespondentJason D. HolohanJohn Patrick LaBuda
Jessica Marie Stull

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/04/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/04/2011Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
04/04/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/03/2011Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
06/17/2011Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
06/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Petitioner and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from Jessica Hendricks indicating that she had made entry of appearance in district court as counsel of record with John LaBuda for appellee, and was attempting to efile brief. Added her as counsel so that brief could be submitted.EventPhone CallFinal
07/28/2011Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
08/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of RespondentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/24/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John LaBuda for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Rehurek for petitioner.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting (by phone) - Jessica Hendricks for respondent.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for petitioner; Jessica Marie Stull and John P. LaBuda, argument by Ms. Stull for respondent) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/22/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/09/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/09/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/09/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/09/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/14/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 3/12/12.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal