judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE E. JOHNSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REGULATORY AFS

Case Information: 11-AA-0082
Short Caption:GEORGE E. JOHNSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REGULATORY AFSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Regulatory Affairs
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DCRAQ106688-10Filed Date:01/28/2011

Opening Event Date:01/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGeorge E. Johnson NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/28/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
01/28/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
01/28/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
02/09/2011 ORDERED that PEGGY CARTER shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of standing since she was not a named party and since she is not an attorney, she cannot file an appeal on another person's behalf...SEE HARDCOPY (BY: ETW)
02/09/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
02/25/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
03/21/2011 On consideration of this court's February 9, 2011 order...the response thereto that stated she has STATUTORY POWER OF ATTORNEY OVER PETITIONER'S AFFAIRS. It is ORDERED that this PFR IS HERBY DISCHARGED. See D.C. Code 21-2112 (6) (2001). It is *****MORE*****
03/21/2011 F/ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (GLPRFE) (cb)
03/24/2011 ****** 3/21/11 ORDER AMENDED ****** ORDERED that the OTSC is hereby discharged. See DC Code 21-2112 (6)(2001). It is ...SEE HARDCOPY (GLPRFE) (cb)
09/26/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
09/26/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/13/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/30/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief & appendix
12/29/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
12/29/2011FiledDismissed
01/05/2012LodgedMotion To Dismiss Appeal **Returned to Petitioner. See order of 12/29/11) (Petitioner)
01/23/2012FiledMandate