judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-97-00023-CV
02-97-00023-CV
01/13/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Horton, Melba Jean
Horton, Mitchel Montgomery (Babe), Henderson Fillmore Horton, and Eric Wayne Horton
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/20/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/02/1998Mandate Issued
04/23/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/30/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/12/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed in Part and Reversed & Rendered in Part
11/18/1997Submitted
11/18/1997Submission
11/10/1997Reply Brief Filed
10/28/1997Sup. Clerk's Record Filed
10/15/1997Letter
07/29/1997Submission
07/11/1997Brief Filed
07/11/1997Case ready to be set
05/12/1997Brief Filed
03/17/1997Submission
03/11/1997Exhibits Filed
03/11/1997No Description Available.
02/12/1997Stipulation by Attorneys
01/30/1997Letter
01/27/1997No Description Available.
01/24/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/14/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Horton, Melba JeanAppellantLeslie Combs
David Spiller
Horton, Eric WayneAppelleeBradley C. Miles
Horton, mitchel Montgomery (BabAppelleeBradley C. Miles
Horton, gail Next Friend EricAppellee
Horton, Henderson FillmoreAppelleeBradley C. Miles
Est Of Henderson(pete) HortonAppelleeBradley C. Miles
Trial Court Information
271st District Court
Jack
Honorable John H. Fostel
9172