judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-97-00020-CV
02-97-00020-CV
01/13/1997
Miscellaneous civil
In the Interest of C.D. and B.P., Children
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/20/1998Mandate Issued
01/08/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/05/1997Submitted
11/05/1997Submission
10/08/1997Letter
05/13/1997Brief Filed
05/13/1997Case ready to be set
03/10/1997Brief Filed
02/14/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/1997No Description Available.
01/28/1997Motion Filed
01/22/1997Submission
01/13/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Petrovish, BriannaCivil - Ad LitemAndrew Ottaway
Dixon, CrystalynCivil - Ad LitemAndrew Ottaway
Dixon, CherlynAppellantEdwin J. Seilheimer
Texas Dept Of Protect & RegulaAppelleeVincent Messina
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Tom Crum
D095017