judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-97-00027-CR
02-97-00027-CR
01/13/1997
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Flagg, John Walter
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/1998Mandate Issued
09/16/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme CourtRefused
05/29/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
04/30/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1998Submitted
04/29/1998Submission
02/20/1998Letter to Attorneys Regarding Panel Members
05/16/1997Brief Filed
05/16/1997Case ready to be set
04/03/1997Brief Filed
04/03/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/17/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
01/13/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Flagg, John WalterCriminal - AppellantRobert Ford
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasTim Curry
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Joseph Drago, III
0558210D
Ct1: 45 yrs IDTDCJ