judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GLENDOL THOMAS BUSH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0138)
Case Number:S-09-0138Case Docketed On:07/20/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:GLENDOL THOMAS BUSH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GLENDOL THOMAS BUSH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGlendol Thomas BushDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/20/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/14/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
09/08/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/15/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
09/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal