judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FULLER (DARRYL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33551
Short Caption:FULLER (DARRYL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33967 , 36743 , 40615 , 45009 , 54737 , 55092 , 56954 , 73520
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109922Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00037
02/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-00732
03/02/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01429
03/02/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/12/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 1999. 99-01429