judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DALLAS RAILWAY AND TERMINAL COMPANY v. LEWIS A. JARVIS

Case: A-4597
A-4597
03/29/1954
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS RAILWAY AND TERMINAL COMPANY
LEWIS A. JARVIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/28/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/13/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/29/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/07/1954Opinion issued
05/28/1954Brief on the Merits
05/05/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/13/1954Response to Petition
03/29/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/29/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lewis A. JarvisRespondent
Dallas Railway and Terminal CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information