Case Information: 33550 | |||
Short Caption: | WHEELER (KAREN) VS. STATE C/W 33548 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 33548 *, 33550 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141200 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/05/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/05/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-00035 | |
01/12/1999 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Christopher Oram shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. | 99-00164 | |
02/22/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw from Representation or in the Alternative Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. | 99-01169 | |
03/11/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant is denied. The motion for an extension of time is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned. | 99-01716 | |
03/23/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-02088 | |
03/23/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 99-02089 | |
04/02/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-02450 | |
04/14/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals for Briefing and Decision Nos. 33548, 33550 | 99-02898 | |
04/29/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. These appeals are subject to the provisions of Nevada Rule of Appellate procedure 3C. On April 14, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to consolidate these appeals for purposes of briefing and disposition. The motion is granted, and these appeals are consolidated. Nos. 33548, 33550. | ||
05/13/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment he clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. Nos. 33548, 33550. | ||
05/24/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 01/05/99 (nos. 33548 & 33550). | 99-04252 | |
06/01/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of complying with the mandates of NRS 34.830(1). The district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to enter an amended written order which resolves appellant's petition and which contains specific findings of fact and conclusions of law and shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the order to the clerk of this court. Nos. 33548, 33550. | ||
07/21/1999 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Amended Order Denying Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) filed in district court on 6/17/99. Nos. 33548, 33550. | 99-06552 | |
10/01/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days of this order file a rough draft transcript request form requesting the transcript of the plea entry conducted on November 13, 1994. Further, counsel shall show cause within15 days why he should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C(d)(3). Nos. 33548, 33550. | 99-09447 | |
10/21/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 33548, 33550. | 99-10287 | |
10/28/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcript filed in district court on October 6, 1999. Transcripts requested: 11/13/94. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. Nos. 33548, 33550. | ||
11/22/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On October 21, 1999, appellant's counsel file his response to this court's order filed October 1, 1999. We decline to impose sanctions on appellant's counsel. In the future, failure to comply with NRAP 3C and orders of this court will result in the imposition of sanctions. Nos. 33548, 33550. | 99-11638 | |
12/03/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy (for Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcripts). Nos. 33548, 33550. | 99-12111 | |
04/26/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] (nos. 33548/33550) NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-06768 | |
05/23/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (Nos. 33548 and 33550) | 00-08464 | |
05/23/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. | 00-08464 |