judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ELK HORN RANCH, INC. v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF CROOK COUNTY, WYOMING and CRAGO RANCH TRUST

Case Heading (S-09-0137)
Case Number:S-09-0137Case Docketed On:07/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:ELK HORN RANCH, INC. v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF CROOK COUNTY, WYOMING and CRAGO RANCH TRUST
Full Title:ELK HORN RANCH, INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF CROOK COUNTY, WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent), and CRAGO RANCH TRUST, Appellee/Intervenor (Applicant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantElk Horn Ranch, Inc.John M. Daly
Matthew Ryan Sorenson
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Crook County, WyomingJoseph Michael Baron
IntervenorCrago Ranch TrustMark L. Hughes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2010 WY 49
Citation:229 P.3d 960

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/16/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/21/2009Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
07/23/2009Petition - Reinstatement with affidavitsPetitionReinstatementFinal
07/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for reinstatement with original affidavits attached.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2009Order - Reinstatement of AppealOrderReinstatementFinal
09/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
09/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Motion for Submission of Case Without Oral Argument and Designation of Record on Appeal (Pleadings received one day late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2009Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for additional copy of brief, received original plus five copies.EventPhone CallFinal
09/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Additional copy of Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2009Motion - Intervene and Motion to Dismiss Appeal of Substantive IssuesMotionInterveneFinal
11/05/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/05/2009Response/Objection - Motion. Response to motion to intervene from appellee.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Response to the Motion to InterveneEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from appellee County CommissionersNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Crook CountyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2009Order - Granting Motion to Intervene, Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Order Clarifying Scope of AppealOrderGrantFinal
12/11/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellee - Crago RanchBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/21/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight total volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-VIII, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/30/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/10/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/10/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/11/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/12/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order amending caption to Elk Horn Ranch, Inc. v. Crago Ranch Trust u/t/a dated September 14, 1992.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal