judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEGASUS-SUNSET VS. CITY OF HENDERSON

Case Information: 33549
Short Caption:PEGASUS-SUNSET VS. CITY OF HENDERSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A393907Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/1999 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/09/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, Chtd.--check no. 14141.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00036
01/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/22/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (mailed on: 01/20/99). 99-00452
02/04/1999Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No.14403 returned to Harrison, Kemp & Jones, Chtd. No filing fee due for amended notice of appeal.
02/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 99-00790
02/11/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter. Thomas J. Tanksley (Amended Notice of Appeal).
02/23/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 2/25/99. 99-01221
03/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/21/99 at 9:00 a.m. at the offices of Harrison, Kemp & Jones, Chtd., 300 S. Fourth St. #600, Las Vegas, NV 89101. Mailed on: 3/3/99. 99-01564
06/01/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Status Report for Settlement Cases 33547, 33549, 33742, 33785. 99-04542
09/03/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference was resumed on May 19, 1999, and the settlement now awaits approval of a revised project within the next few months. 99-08312
11/24/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January, 2000. 99-11774
10/16/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-18326
10/25/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-18831
11/14/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/23/98 and 01/19/99. To Court Reporter: Linda Osborne. 00-19916
02/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no transcripts have been filed with this court. Court reporter Osborne shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the transcripts requested of her. If more time is needed, court reporter Osborne shall, within the same time period, file a motion with this court requesting an extension of time. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, court reporter Osborne shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 01-03513
02/26/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 02/22/01. 01-03567
02/26/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-03569
03/22/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 6, 2001. 01-05063
03/23/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 19, 1999. Court Reporter: Linda M. Osborne. 01-05145
04/09/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/06/01. 01-06046
04/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 14, 2000, appellant filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of transcripts by court reporter Linda Osborne. To date, no transcripts have been filed with this court. Accordingly, court reporter Osborne shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the transcripts requested of her. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, court reporter Osborne shall, within the same time period, file a motion with this court requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, court reporter Osborne shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 01-07144
05/09/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 05/07/01. 01-07740
06/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 27, 2001, we entered an order directing Ms. Osborne to file the transcripts for November 23, 1998, within twenty days of the date of that order. Because it appears that the November 23, 1998, transcript is not necessary for our review of this appeal, we vacate our April 27, 2001, order directing Ms. Osborne to prepare and file that transcript. 01-10825
11/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-18711
11/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
02/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. We "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMANDthis matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP02--CY/DA/ML 02-02578
03/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02746
03/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 7, 2002. 02-02746