judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFF LEE JEWART v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0093)
Case Number:S-11-0093Case Docketed On:04/15/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JEFF LEE JEWART v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEFF LEE JEWART, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeff Lee JewartDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/15/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/26/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/06/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal