judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP V. DIANNE BUGGS, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0096
Short Caption:BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP V. DIANNE BUGGS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR3443-09Filed Date:01/27/2011

Opening Event Date:01/27/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBAC Home Loans Servicing, LpN
Michael J. QuartaroneYN
AppelleeDianne Buggs N
John C. KeeneyYN
AppelleeEstate of Jerome HenryN
Wendell C. RobinsonNY
AppelleeWilma Henry N
Wendell C. RobinsonNY
AppelleeGary Barbee N
James A. DevitaNN
AppelleeSentry Title, LLCNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/27/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/07/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 27, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
02/11/2011RECORD INDEX
02/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/28/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/28/2011APPENDIX
04/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (Buggs)
05/03/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on March 28, 2011, and that the briefs of appellees were due to be filed with this court on or before May 2, 2011, and it appearing that appellees the Estate of Jerome Henry, Wilma Henry, Gary Barbee, and Sentry Title have failed to file their briefs, it is ORDERED that appellees, the Estate of Jerome Henry, Wilma Henry, Gary Barbee, and Sentry Title,LLC., shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit their briefs, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file their briefs or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. (JAC) elp
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
05/25/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 3, 2011, which directed appellee the Estate of Jerome Henry, Wila Henry, Gary Barbee, and Sentry Title, LLC., to submit their briefs within 15 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the briefs have not yet been filed, it is ORDEREd that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. (ETW) elp
05/25/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
06/30/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/08/2011FiledCOUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (Dianne Buggs)Granted
07/25/2011FiledOrder Granting COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (Dianne Buggs)
08/05/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellee Sentry Title, LLC)
08/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellee Sentry Title, LLC)
09/12/2011FiledReceived 8/26/11, Order mailed to appellee Sentry Title, LLC, and returned by U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable." Contacted the law office of former counsel for appellee Errol Thompson this date and provided the most current address for Sentry Title, LLC. - 12205 Torrey Pines Terrace, Belstville, MD 20705, and remailed to this address this date. elp (Appellee Sentry Title, LLC) Response DUE 15 days from today 9/27/11. elp
10/13/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte scheduling this appeal before a merits division of this court.
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/13/2011FiledArgued Before Washington,Blackburne-Rigsby,Belson Michael J.Quartarone Esq.,for appellant John C.Keeney Esq.,for appellee
03/22/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge and Belson, Senior Judge.)
04/13/2012FiledMandate