judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHEELER (KAREN) VS. STATE C/W 33550

Case Information: 33548
Short Caption:WHEELER (KAREN) VS. STATE C/W 33550Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:33548*, 33550
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123602Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00034
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Christopher Oram shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00162
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days from the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-02392
04/14/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals for Briefing and Decision Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-02897
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. These appeals are subject to the provisions of Nevada Rule of Appellate procedure 3C. On April 14, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to consolidate these appeals for purposes of briefing and disposition. The motion is granted, and these appeals are consolidated. Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-03441
05/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-03901
05/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 01/05/99 (nos. 33548 & 33550). 99-04250
06/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of complying with the mandates of NRS 34.830(1). The district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to enter an amended written order which resolves appellant's petition and which contains specific findings of fact and conclusions of law and shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the order to the clerk of this court. Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-04517
07/21/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Amended Order Denying Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) filed in district court on 6/17/99. Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-06551
10/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days of this order file a rough draft transcript request form requesting the transcript of the plea entry conducted on November 13, 1994. Further, counsel shall show cause within15 days why he should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C(d)(3). Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-09445
10/21/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-10286
10/28/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcript filed in district court on October 6, 1999. Transcripts requested: 11/13/94. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-10554
11/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 21, 1999, appellant's counsel file his response to this court's order filed October 1, 1999. We decline to impose sanctions on appellant's counsel. In the future, failure to comply with NRAP 3C and orders of this court will result in the imposition of sanctions. Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-11636
12/03/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy (for Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcripts). Nos. 33548, 33550. 99-12110
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] (nos. 33548/33550) NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-06766
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (Nos. 33548 and 33550) 00-08462
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. 00-08462