judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MERIDIAN GRANITE COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS v. JOHN SUTHERLAND and MINERVA SELBE SUTHERLAND

Case Heading (S-11-0092)
Case Number:S-11-0092Case Docketed On:04/14/2011
Linked To: S-11-0091
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:MERIDIAN GRANITE COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS v. JOHN SUTHERLAND and MINERVA SELBE SUTHERLAND
Full Title:MERIDIAN GRANITE COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, Appellant (Defendant), v. JOHN SUTHERLAND and MINERVA SELBE SUTHERLAND, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMeridian Granite Company, a Delaware corporationFranklin D. O'Loughlin
Jaclyn K. Casey
AppelleeJohn SutherlandBruce S. Asay
AppelleeMinerva Selbe SutherlandBruce S. Asay

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2012 WY 53
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/14/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
04/14/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/25/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
05/18/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission of Jaclyn K. Casey Pro hace viceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
05/24/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellate BriefsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/31/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/15/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Cross-Appeal Opening Brief of Cross-AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' response brief to cross-appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2011Record - Received unfiled record (four volumes) via fed-ex from counsel for appellee by error. Should have been mailed to the Clerk of District Court. Record hand delivered to the Clerk of District Court by Clerk of Supreme Court this date.RecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/30/2011Notice-Incoming - No designation of recordNotice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
08/30/2011Order - Sanction - designation of record - both counsel (electronic version can be viewed on case S-11-0091).OrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
09/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of compliance with August 30, 2011 order; and copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2011Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Franklin D. O'Loughlin for Meridian Granite Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Status report - other - compliance with order sanctioning counsel for failure to designate record by counsel for Sutherlands.Notice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
09/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bruce Asay for Meridian Granite Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of the Appellants, John Sutherland and Minerva Selbe Sutherland, of compliance with court's orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/26/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bruce S. Asay for Sutherlands; Jaclyn K. Casey and Franklin D. O'Loughlin, argument by Mr. O'Loughlin for Meridian Granite Company) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/26/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court. Justice Hill files a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Golden joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/26/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/26/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/11/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal