Case Information: 11-CV-0095 | |||
Short Caption: | RHYS W. ROBINSON, ETAL V. GEORGETOWN COURT CONDOMINIUM, LLC | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB8633-08 | Filed Date: | 01/24/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/24/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 02/17/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/24/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/15/2011 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/13/2014 |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Appellant | First Tennessee Bank Na | N |
| ||||||||||||
Appellant | Rhys W. Robinson | N |
| ||||||||||||
Appellee | Georgetown Court Condominuium LLc. | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/24/2011 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
02/10/2011 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 24, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp | |||
02/11/2011 | STATEMENT -from aplt certificate pursuant to rule 10(b)(1)(b) *(stating that NO TRANSCRIPT is needed for this appeal) (elp) | |||
02/17/2011 | RECORD INDEX | |||
02/17/2011 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
02/22/2011 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp | |||
04/04/2011 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
04/04/2011 | APPENDIX | |||
04/25/2011 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO TO 5/24/11 | |||
04/25/2011 | APPEARANCE - of John D.V. Ferman on behalf of aple | |||
04/27/2011 | On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an extension of time within whicn to file appellee's brief and appellant's reply brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 24, 2011, and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before June 13, 2011. (JAC) elp | |||
04/29/2011 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo to 7/1/11 | |||
05/03/2011 | On consideration of appellants' consent motion to amend this court's order of April 27, 2011, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before July 1, 2011. (JAC) elp | |||
05/24/2011 | APPEARANCE - of Allen V. Farber on behalf of aple(Georgetown Court Condominium) | |||
05/24/2011 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/24/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/16/2011 | Filed | Final Screening-Regular | ||
06/30/2011 | It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk | |||
07/01/2011 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF | |||
07/20/2011 | Filed | Letter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant First Tennessee Bank Na, Appellant Robinson, Appellee Georgetown Court Condominuium LLc.) | ||
11/03/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
12/15/2011 | Filed | Argued before Judges Fisher, Thompson, Steadman | ||
03/22/2012 | Filed | Affirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the trial court's judgment is affirmed) | ||
04/05/2012 | Filed | Petition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant First Tennessee Bank Na, Appellant Robinson) | Denied | |
05/16/2012 | Filed | Ordered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto. | ||
05/30/2012 | Filed | Answer/Response to appellant's petition for rehearing (Appellee) | ||
11/05/2013 | Filed | Order Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc. | ||
03/13/2014 | Filed | Mandate |