judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARREN (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33540
Short Caption:BARREN (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33678
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117383Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/03/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/04/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00005
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 31667, 33292, 33315, 33354, 33392, 33508, 33540, 33541, 33543, 33544. 99-00303
05/03/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. Mailed on 4/30/99. 99-03491
05/03/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-04386
07/12/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-06186
07/28/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-06870
07/28/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/18/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 1999. 99-06870