judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREGORY VS. ESTATE OF GREGORY

Case Information: 34629
Short Caption:GREGORY VS. ESTATE OF GREGORYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D230077Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/25/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Benjamin B. Childs--check no. 3553.
08/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07237
08/11/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/20/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Rebecca A. Miller stating that respondent in this matter is deceased and she is no longer counsel of record in this matter. 99-07794
08/23/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Copy of letter from attorney Benjamin Childs addressed to attorney Rebecca Miller. 99-07874
09/02/1999MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to Substitute Proper Party. 99-08271
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant appellant's motion for substitution of parties. The clerk shall amend the caption to reflect that respondent in this matter is Pepper McBride, Administrator of the Estate of Belinda Gregory, deceased. In the event that respondent has already retained counsel, respondent shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, cause counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. If respondent has not retained counsel, respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. Failure to retain counsel may result in this matter being submitted for decision based solely upon the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, serve and file the docketing statement and fully comply with NRAP 9(a). Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-09040
10/11/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-09802
10/11/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/23/98, 11/10/98, 4/28/99, 8/18/99. To Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 99-09804
10/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing 1) Docketing Statement; and 2) Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 99-09805
11/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-10637
11/04/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant has moved for a 45 day extension to and including December 13, 1999, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. The opening brief and appendix are not due to be filed until December 5, 1999. The motion is denied as moot. 99-10831
11/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 9/23/98; 11/10/98; 4/28/99; and 8/18/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. (TRANSCRIPTS SEALED). 99-11703
12/09/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/06/99. 99-12353
12/09/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-12354
07/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To date respondent has failed to comply with the order of September 22, 1999, or otherwise to communicate with this court. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision based upon appellant's opening brief and appendix. 00-11674
07/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Upon appellant's opening brief and appendix.
09/25/2000Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: SNP00A-CY/WM/NB.
12/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered Gary's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-21454
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21746
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21746