judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF CHARLES LEROY CRAGO AND OLIVE K. CRAGO, CO-TRUSTEES OF THE CRAGO RANCH TRUST u/t/a DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 1992, FOR A PRIVATE ROAD: ELK HORN RANCH, INC., v. THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF CROOK COUNTY, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0007)
Case Number:S-07-0007Case Docketed On:01/09/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF CHARLES LEROY CRAGO AND OLIVE K. CRAGO, CO-TRUSTEES OF THE CRAGO RANCH TRUST u/t/a DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 1992, FOR A PRIVATE ROAD: ELK HORN RANCH, INC., v. THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF CROOK COUNTY, WYOMING
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF CHARLES LEROY CRAGO AND OLIVE K. CRAGO, CO-TRUSTEES OF THE CRAGO RANCH TRUST u/t/a DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 1992, FOR A PRIVATE ROAD: ELK HORN RANCH, INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF CROOK COUNTY, WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantElk Horn Ranch, Inc.Max S. Main
Wade Eliot Nyberg
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Crook County, WyomingJoseph Michael Baron

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Roads
Opinion Number:2007 WY 158
Citation:168 P.3d 845

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
01/09/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/09/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
01/28/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
02/26/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
04/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - Appellant's request for placement on expedited docket.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/09/2007Brief - Appellee Crook County and received copy on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
04/17/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/25/2007Brief - Appellant reply - filed one day lateBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/30/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/01/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record; Volume III, Transcript; Volume IV, Audio and Video TapesRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/08/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/24/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/24/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/26/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal