judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JACKSON, JAMES E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0763
Short Caption:JACKSON, JAMES E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3049-79Filed Date:05/19/1980

Opening Event Date:05/19/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/20/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
Melvin M. Dildine NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, JAMES E. AKA JAMES JACKSON UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 VACATED CLAIRE O. DUCKER, SR.
05/19/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/20/1984FiledRecord Completed
12/21/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition