judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-97-00057-CR
14-97-00057-CR
01/16/1997
All Misdemeanors
Sanchez, Hector P.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/15/1997Case stored
03/31/1997Mandate due to be issued
03/31/1997Mandate Issued
03/31/1997Mandate Issued
03/17/1997No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/17/1997Petition for discretionary review due
02/28/1997Motion for rehearing DUE
02/28/1997No motion for rehearing FILED
02/13/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/13/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/12/1997Submission
02/12/1997Submitted
02/12/1997Case ready to be set
02/03/1997Record due
01/16/1997Transcript received only; mtn. pending
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/14/1997Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
12/03/1996Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/2017Case StoredCase archived
03/31/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 4
Harris
Honorable JAMES MICHAEL ANDERSON
5181