judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-97-00043-CV
04-97-00043-CV
01/15/1997
Bond Forfeiture
Bruce E. Embrey
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/11/1997Mandate Issued
06/11/1997Mandate Issued
04/16/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/16/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/02/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
03/31/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/11/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/28/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/28/1997Information regarding cause received
02/28/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/13/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/11/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/15/1997No Description Available.
01/15/1997No Description Available.
01/15/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/06/1997Appeal Bond Filed
11/07/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
10/10/1996Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserAppelleeSteven C. Hilbig
Bruce E. EmbreyAppellantR. Norvell Graham, Jr. Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Bexar
Honorable Bill M. White
231,243
n/a