judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOJRAB VS. KRAMER

Case Information: 33531
Short Caption:BOJRAB VS. KRAMERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A380432Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/13/1999 / Putney, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks--check no. 4657.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00547
01/11/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00129
01/13/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David H. Putney. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued within the next sixty (60) days. 99-07600
04/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 00-06780
04/27/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-06866
05/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on April 26, 2000, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK 00-07513
05/08/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.