judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL SCOTT CARROLL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0074)
Case Number:S-11-0074Case Docketed On:03/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL SCOTT CARROLL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL SCOTT CARROLL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Scott Carroll Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 117
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/16/2011Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
05/16/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant, pro seMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/16/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Eric Alden.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/16/2011Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
05/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2011Order - Granting Permission for Court-Appointed Counsel to WithdrawOrderGrantFinal
07/26/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellant (Anders)BriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
08/10/2011Opinion - Published order Affirming the District Court's "Order Revoking Probation and Judgment and Sentence"OpinionPublished orderFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/26/2011Record - Returned unfiled record to district court clerk, four volumes.RecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/26/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/30/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/29/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal