judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOWELL DONTE ALLEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0083
Short Caption:LOWELL DONTE ALLEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-26648-09Filed Date:01/20/2011

Opening Event Date:01/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/03/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/17/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/20/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLowell Donte Allen YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Katherine SawyerYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (33 pgs/Armstrong) 10/21/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (132 pgs/Hunt) 10/25/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (199 pgs/Hunt) 10/26/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (200-382 pgs/Hunt) 10/27/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (383-546 pgs/Hunt) 10/28/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (35 pgs/Zamora) 11/1/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (171 pgs/Zamora) 11/2/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (124 pgs/Zamora) 11/3/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (7 pgs/Zamora) 11/4/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (20 pgs/tape) 1/12/11 proc. w/cd
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES
04/20/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (SEALED documents)
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/24/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (6 pgs/Hunt) 10/25/10 proc. w/cd (REFILED AS SEALED, SEE ORDER DATED 5/18/12)
06/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 6, 2011. (JAC)
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (12 pgs/Zamora) 11/4/10 proc. w/cd
08/12/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)
08/31/2011FiledORDER SUA SPONTE - Withdraw Appointed Counsel James W. Klein, Esquire and appointing Joanne M. Vasco, Esquire.
08/31/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/27/2011LodgedReceived pro se letter from Appellant requesting that we have court-appointed counsel contact him. (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring the pro se letter received from appellant on September 27.
11/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 2/28/11.
02/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) (REFILED AS SEALED, SEE ORDER DATED 5/18/12)
02/28/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
03/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/3/12.
05/03/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/03/2012FiledMotion to place transcript and portions of Appellant's brief under seal. (Appellee)Granted
05/03/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/18/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion to place transcript and portions of Appellant's brief under seal. (Appellee)
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/17/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Fisher, Newman
11/27/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
12/04/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/20/2012FiledMandate