judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0079-97
PD-0079-97
01/16/1997
PDR Case Type
BAUDER, EX PARTE SAMUEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/08/1997BRIEF FILEDState
05/29/1997BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
09/18/1998MANDATE ISSD
09/16/1998REHEAR DISPDENIED
09/16/1998REHEAR DISPDENIED
06/18/1998REHEAR FILED GPDR
06/18/1998REHEAR FILED
06/10/1998OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/10/1998OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/10/1998OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/10/1998OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
09/10/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
09/10/1997SUBMITTED
08/08/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
08/08/1997BRIEF FILED
08/08/1997SET FOR SUBMIS
07/25/1997EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
07/25/1997EXT BRIEF FILED
06/25/1997EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
06/25/1997EXT BRIEF FILED
05/29/1997BRIEF FILED
05/12/1997LETTER RECEIVED
05/09/1997EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
05/09/1997EXT BRIEF FILED
04/09/1997PDR GRANTED
04/09/1997PDR DISPGranted
04/09/1997PDR DISPGranted
01/16/1997PDR FILED
01/16/1997PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/1998STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BAUDER, EX PARTE SAMUELApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John A. Hrncir
STATE OF TEXASStateSusan D Reed
Court of Appeals Information:
04-93-00725-CR
AFF 10-30-96
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 8
Bexar
Honorable Miguel Rodriguez
531141