judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 97-0051
97-0051
01/16/1997
See former TRAP 130(D)
TODD MORRIS and JEFF SCHAFFER
THE DALLAS MORNING NEWS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/24/1997Reply to ResponseRespondent
02/05/1997Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Todd Morris & Jeff Schafer
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/21/1997list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksCOA Ape brief missing.
05/21/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
03/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
02/26/1997Case forwarded to Court
02/24/1997Reply to Response
02/05/1997Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Todd Morris & Jeff Schafer
02/05/1997Brief filed that is difficult to read due to colorRed Covers on Applications from Atty David Martin
01/17/1997APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED01-24-97
01/17/1997Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp is due in the C.O.A. on or before 01-24-97
01/16/1997Amended certificate/deposit of cash for costfrom Atty David Martin, 4 Copies, Original and 11 copies received 1/17/97
01/16/1997Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/1997Case StoredCase stored.1G5 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SCHAEFFER, JEFFPetitionerMr. David H. Martin
MORRIS, TODDPetitionerMr. David H. Martin
THE DALLAS MORNING NEWSRespondentMr. R. Matt Dawson
Mr. Paul C. Watler
Court of Appeals Information:
10-96-00024-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
934 SW2d 410, 11-13-96
10th Court of Appeals
Honorable Bobby L. Cummings
Trial Court Information
13th District Court
Navarro
Honorable Kenneth A. Douglas
94-00-0414-CV