judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-97-00050-CR
14-97-00050-CR
01/16/1997
Other Drug Possession
Joshua, Kelvin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/14/1999Case stored
03/24/1999Mandate due to be issued
03/24/1999Mandate Issued
03/24/1999Mandate Issued
03/01/1999No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/01/1999Petition for discretionary review due
02/12/1999Motion for rehearing DUE
02/12/1999No motion for rehearing FILED
01/28/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/28/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/27/1999Case ready to be set
01/27/1999Submitted
01/27/1999Submission
01/27/1999Submitted
01/27/1999Case ready to be set
01/14/1999Past Due Notices sent to staff attorney for ORDER
08/04/1998Hearing Record FILED
06/18/1998Hearing Record FILED
03/12/1998Hearing record DUE
02/12/1998Order Entered
01/09/1998Past due brief
01/05/1998Appellant's brief DUE
12/18/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/12/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/04/1997Past due brief
10/30/1997Appellant's brief DUE
10/16/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/09/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/07/1997Past due brief
08/04/1997Appellant's brief DUE
07/03/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
06/18/1997Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
03/11/1997No description available.
03/10/1997Record due
03/10/1997Transcript FILED
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/09/1997Date of Sentence
01/09/1997Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/03/2023Case StoredCase archived
03/24/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joshua, KelvinCriminal - AppellantR. Scott Shearer
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
Honorable JAMES MICHAEL WILKINSON
677,332
3 Years TDCJ