judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-97-00070-CV
05-97-00070-CV
01/15/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Jill Brown Dickerson
Abbott Laboratories Individually and D/B/A A P Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
11/19/2015Letter issued by the court
05/25/1999Record RetentionDestroy
05/21/1999Mandate Issued
05/21/1999Mandate Issued
02/25/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/25/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/24/1999Motion to Show Authorities
01/27/1999Submitted
01/27/1999Submission
01/27/1999Submitted
01/25/1999Letter Filed
01/21/1999Notice Filed
11/18/1998Letter Filed
11/10/1998Submission
04/08/1997Brief Filed
04/08/1997Case ready to be set
04/08/1997MattConv
04/08/1997Case ready to be set
03/14/1997Brief Filed
03/11/1997MattConv
02/15/1997Record due
02/14/1997Transcript Filed
01/15/1997Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant
01/15/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/14/1997Appeal Bond Filed
12/17/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Abbott Laboratories IndividualAppelleeCheryl E. Diaz
Debora B. Alsup
Deborah Lin
Dickerson, Jill BrownAppellantRodney Gappelberg
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
95-11754-G