judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITNEY HOLDING CORPORATION v. CLARENCE WILLIAM TERRY AND PEGGY ANN TERRY, TRUSTEES OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 27, 1990

Case Heading (S-11-0075)
Case Number:S-11-0075Case Docketed On:03/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:WHITNEY HOLDING CORPORATION v. CLARENCE WILLIAM TERRY AND PEGGY ANN TERRY, TRUSTEES OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 27, 1990
Full Title:WHITNEY HOLDING CORPORATION, Appellant (Defendant), v. CLARENCE WILLIAM TERRY AND PEGGY ANN TERRY, TRUSTEES OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 27, 1990, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWhitney Holding CorporationDan B. Riggs
Mistee Lyn Elliott
Joseph E. Jones
AppelleeClarence William TerryS. Thomas Throne
Jacob Thomas Haseman
AppelleePeggy Ann TerryS. Thomas Throne
Jacob Thomas Haseman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Limitation of Actions, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2012 WY 21
Citation:270 P.3d 662

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/30/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/11/2011Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
05/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Whitney Holding Company and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Clarence William Terry and Peggy Ann Terry, Trustees of the Declaration of Trust Dated February 27, 1990.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jacob T. Haseman and S. Thomas Throne for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/11/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/12/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
07/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Whitney Hold CorporationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission to practice pro hac vice; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Joseph E. JonesOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
07/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes, Volume I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mistee L. Godwin and Joseph E. Jones for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mistee Lyn Godwin and Joseph E. Jones, argument by Mr. Jones for appellant; Jacob Thomas Haseman and S. Thomas Throne, argument by Messrs. Haseman and Throne for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinion in which Chief Justice Kite joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/02/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/02/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/5/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal