judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GALEN E. MURPHY, INDIVIDUALLY. EXECUTOR, ET AL. v. JOHN O. SLATON, ET AL.

Case: A-4611
A-4611
04/02/1954
Application for Writ of Error
GALEN E. MURPHY, INDIVIDUALLY. EXECUTOR, ET AL.
JOHN O. SLATON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/22/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/12/1954Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/12/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/02/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/22/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/08/1954Opinion issued
05/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/12/1954Response to Petition
04/12/1954Response to Petition
04/02/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/02/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Galen E. Murphy, individually. Executor, et al.Petitioner
John O. Slaton, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information