judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LINH PHAM V. GEORGETOWN NAILS, INC.

Case Information: 11-AA-0088
Short Caption:LINH PHAM V. GEORGETOWN NAILS, INC.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02681-10Filed Date:02/02/2011

Opening Event Date:02/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/25/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLinh Pham YPro SeN
RespondentGeorgetown Nails IncorporatedN
Lloyd J. JordanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
02/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Served by: DCCA on 2/2/11).
02/17/2011ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS without prejudice to its renewal within 20 days from the date of this order by filing a fully completed motion and financial information statement or tender the $100 filing fee. See D.C. App. r. 24 (b). Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is F/O that this matter is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (ETW)
02/23/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/09/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to February 2, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
03/09/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
04/06/2011APPEARANCE - of Lloyd J. Jordan counsel for the respondent
06/22/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Linh Pham
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (12/13/10 proc.)
06/30/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
06/30/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (dlm)
08/17/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
08/17/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to brief) (Petitioner)
09/21/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
09/21/2011FiledAppendix (Respondent)
09/21/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/23/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/01/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Farrell
05/03/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Assoicate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge)
05/25/2012FiledMandate