judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE VS. WAITS C/W 33682

Case Information: 33552
Short Caption:WHITE VS. WAITS C/W 33682Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:33552*, 33682 Related Case(s): 33682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A356898Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/1999 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Adam Levine--check no. 4180.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00038
01/05/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 1/5/99. 99-00152
01/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00224
01/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/09/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. The notice to pay the supreme court filing fee in docket No. 33682 issued on January 29, 1999, is vacated. These consolidated matters shall be assigned to Settlement Judge Jay Earl Smith for a single settlement conference. fn1 [Docket No. 33552 was assigned to Settlement Judge Smith on January 15, 1999.] Nos. 33552, 33682. 99-00890
03/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the following document in docket No. 33682: the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Nos. 33552, 33682. 99-01893
03/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter (nos. 33552 & 33682). 99-02005
03/19/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (nos. 33552 & 33682). 99-02006
03/19/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. (nos. 33552 & 33682). 99-02015
03/24/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Filed March 16, 1999. Nos. 33552, 33682. 99-02128
04/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, submit the $200 filing fee in docket No. 33682. We defer fuling on the stipulation to dismiss this appeal pending the submission of the filing fee. Failure to comply with this order may result in the impostion of sanctions. fn1 Because these matters will be dismissed once the filing fee is paid, we vacate our March 16, 1999, order directing appellant to file the docketing statement in docket No. 33682. Nos. 33552, 33682. 99-02413
04/28/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant need not pay the filing fee in the subsequent appeal and we hereby vacate that portion of our april 1, 1999, order directing appellant to pay the filing fee in Docket No. 33682. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in these matters and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . we hereby dismiss these appeals." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML Nos. 33552, 33682 99-03373
04/28/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued. Nos. 33552, 33682.