judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9548
A-9548
04/15/1963
Application for Writ of Error
R. A. BENSON, SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS, ET AL.
SAN ANTONIO SAVING ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/20/1963Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/09/1963Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
11/29/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/03/1963Amended PetitionRespondent
05/03/1963Reply to ResponseRespondent
05/02/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1963Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/15/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/15/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/20/1963Reply to Response
12/16/1963Response to Motion filed
12/09/1963Brief in Support of Petition
11/29/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/13/1963Dissenting opinion issued.
11/13/1963Dissenting opinion issued.
11/13/1963Opinion issued
06/05/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1963Document received (See Remarks)
05/03/1963Amended Petition
05/03/1963Reply to Response
05/02/1963Response to Petition
04/26/1963Response to Petition
04/15/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/15/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/15/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. A. Benson, Savings and Loan Commissioner of Texas, et al.Petitioner
San Antonio Saving AssociationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information