judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9515
A-9515
03/22/1963
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS HIGHWAY COMMISSION, ET AL.
TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF STEEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/1963Response to Brief filedRespondent
12/05/1963Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
11/21/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/19/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/05/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/12/1963Letter Filed
12/06/1963Response to Brief filed
12/05/1963Brief in Support of Petition
11/29/1963Miscellaneous Motion
11/21/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/06/1963Opinion issued
11/06/1963Dissenting opinion issued.
11/06/1963Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1963Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1963Document received (See Remarks)
04/19/1963Reply to Response
04/05/1963Response to Petition
03/22/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/22/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Highway Commission, et al.Petitioner
Texas Association of SteelRespondent
Brantley HarrisAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information