Case Heading (S-09-0126) | |||||
Case Number: | S-09-0126 | Case Docketed On: | 06/29/2009 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Uniform Commercial Code (Title 34.1) | ||
Short Title: | JOHN ARTHUR TAYLOR, JR. v. CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, KEITH NACHBAR, ROBERT HAND, WILL CHAMBERS, AND JIMMY BRIERLY agents for CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | ||||
Full Title: | JOHN ARTHUR TAYLOR, JR., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, KEITH NACHBAR, ROBERT HAND, WILL CHAMBERS, AND JIMMY BRIERLY agents for CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | John Arthur Taylor Jr. | Pro Se |
Appellee | The City of Casper | P. Craig Silva |
Appellee | Keith Robert Nachbar | P. Craig Silva |
Appellee | Robert Jerry Hand | P. Craig Silva |
Appellee | Jimmy Brierly | P. Craig Silva |
Appellee | William R. Chambers | P. Craig Silva |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
06/29/2009 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
06/29/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
06/29/2009 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
06/29/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
07/02/2009 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
07/14/2009 | Order - Dismiss - jurisdiction | Order | Dismiss - jurisdiction | Final | |
07/16/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Other - "Notice of Void Order." No action. | Notice-Incoming | Other | Final | |
07/28/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Other - Request for Clarification | Notice-Incoming | Other | Final | |
08/18/2009 | Order - Denying Request for Clarification | Order | Deny | Final | |
08/18/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/20/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Other - received "Notice of Non-Acceptance" - no action. | Notice-Incoming | Other | Final |