judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4623
A-4623
04/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, E. J. MCCURDY, JR., TRUSTEE AND ALVIS VANDYGRIFF, E. J. MCCURDY, JR., TRUSTEE, ET AL.
A. O. MORGAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/19/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/17/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/08/1954Brief on the Merits
07/15/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/14/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/17/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/12/1954Appendix Filed
05/12/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/19/1954Reply to Response
11/17/1954Response to Brief filed
10/29/1954Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
10/08/1954Brief on the Merits
07/15/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/14/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/17/1954Reply to Response
05/12/1954Appendix Filed
05/12/1954Response to Petition
04/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. O. Morgan, et al.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
E. J. McCurdy, Jr., Trustee and Alvis VandygriffPetitioner
E. J. McCurdy, Jr., Trustee, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information