Case Information: 11-CV-0069 | |||
Short Caption: | KENNETH HINTON V. JAMES W. RUDASILL | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAM4484-08 | Filed Date: | 01/19/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/19/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 02/11/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/03/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/14/2011 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/19/2012 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Appellant | Kenneth Hinton | Y | Pro Se | N | |
Appellee | James W. Rudasill | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/19/2011 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
02/07/2011 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 19, 2011 , and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp | |||
02/11/2011 | RECORD INDEX | |||
02/11/2011 | RECORD COPIES | |||
02/11/2011 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
02/16/2011 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp | |||
03/28/2011 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF (no appendix) | |||
03/30/2011 | It appearing that the brief of appellant was filed with this court on March 28, 2011, and it further appearing that the appendix was due to be filed on or before March 28, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (JAC) elp | |||
04/06/2011 | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WAIVE APPENDIX (dwm) | |||
04/12/2011 | TMC - motion to waive appendix | |||
05/11/2011 | ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO WAIVE the APPENDIX IS GRANTED to the extent that appellant must only file those documents required by DC App. R. 30(f)(2001) W/N 20 DAYS...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE SHALL FILE THE BRIEF W/N 30 DAYS from the date the appendix is filed. | |||
05/20/2011 | APPENDIX | |||
07/06/2011 | On consideration of this court's order of May 11, 2011, directing appellee to file his brief within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court, and it appearing that the appendix was filed with this court on May 20, 2011, and appellee's brief was due to be filed on or before June 2, 2011, and the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp | |||
08/03/2011 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte scheduling for consideration before a merits division | ||
08/03/2011 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
09/23/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring | ||
11/03/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
12/14/2011 | Filed | Submitted before Newman, Belson, Schwelb | ||
07/27/2012 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Newman, Belson and Steadman, Senior Judges.) | ||
09/19/2012 | Filed | Mandate |